Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 34 Online
» 786 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5894 Week
» 35392 Month
» 372238 Year
» 1593803 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1519 m/e 11/1899
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4519 m/e 01/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7374 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 67374 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C12
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 214
Works Number 840
To Service During 11/1899
Withdrawal Wed 02/04/1958
Scrapping During 04/1958
Service Life 58 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1899
LTH Louth on 01/01/1948
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 21/07/1951
   Withdrawn on 02/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31D South Lynn w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 3w/e 28/07/1951
WDN   on 02/04/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1921 Condensers removed
01/1948 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1899 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1519
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 840
   
03/1921 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 4519    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7374    
01/1948 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Louth (LTH)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 67374    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
02/04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67374    

prev prev