Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 652 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14058 Week
» 67074 Month
» 186601 Year
» 3213454 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1519 |
m/e |
11/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4519 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7374 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
67374 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
214 |
Works Number |
840 |
To Service |
During 11/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 02/04/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
KX |
Kings Cross |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
31D |
South Lynn |
w/e |
30/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
3w/e |
28/07/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/04/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1921 |
Condensers removed |
01/1948 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1519 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 840 |
|
|
03/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4519 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7374 |
|
|
01/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Louth (LTH) |
|
|
10/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67374 |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
02/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67374 |
|
|