Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 525 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2432 Week
» 21214 Month
» 269507 Year
» 1153888 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1520 m/e 11/1899
LNER (1924) 4520 m/e 05/1924
LNER (1946) 7375 m/e 09/1946
BR 67375 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C12
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 214
Works Number 841
To Service During 11/1899
Withdrawal Tue 05/04/1955
Scrapping During 04/1955
Service Life 55 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 19/04/1952
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 15/11/1952
   Withdrawn 05/04/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   05/04/1955
ALLOC NEMPA   4w/e 23/04/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1921 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1899 To Service To service as GNR Number 1520
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 841
   
05/1921 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
05/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 4520    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7375    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67375    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
04/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67375    

prev prev