Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1648 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19451 Week
» 72467 Month
» 191994 Year
» 3218847 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1527 |
m/e |
06/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4527 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7380 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
British Railways |
67380 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
223 |
Works Number |
930 |
To Service |
During 06/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 30/05/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
10/11/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/05/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1922 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1527 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 930 |
|
|
03/1922 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4527 |
|
|
24/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7380 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67380 |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
05/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
30/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67380 |
|
|