Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 215 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 215 Week
» 11786 Month
» 260079 Year
» 1144460 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1534 m/e 12/1903
LNER (1924) 4534 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 7385 m/e 11/1946
BR 67385 m/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C12
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 234
Works Number 1020
To Service During 12/1903
Withdrawal Fri 01/04/1955
Scrapping During 04/1955
Service Life 51 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 5w/e 23/08/1952
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 15/11/1952
   Withdrawn 01/04/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   01/04/1955
ALLOC NEMPA   4w/e 23/04/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1922 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1903 To Service To service as GNR Number 1534
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1020
   
07/1922 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4534    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7385    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 67385    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
04/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67385    

prev prev