Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1539 m/e 01/1904
LNER (1924) 4539 m/e 06/1925
LNER (1946) 7389 m/e 09/1946
BR 67389 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C12
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 234
Works Number 1025
To Service During 01/1904
Withdrawal Fri 15/04/1955
Scrapping During 04/1955
Service Life 51 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LTH Louth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40A Lincoln 4w/e 23/09/1950
31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/12/1950
35A New England 4w/e 19/05/1951
   Withdrawn 15/04/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40A Lincoln w/e 27/08/1950
ALLOC 31A Cambridge m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 35A New England w/e 05/05/1951
WDN   15/04/1955
ALLOC NEMPA   4w/e 23/04/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1921 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as GNR Number 1539
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1025
   
11/1921 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
06/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4539    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7389    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Louth (LTH)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67389    
23/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
04/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67389    

prev prev