Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1545 m/e 07/1907
LNER (1924) 4545 m/e 05/1927
LNER (1946) 7395 m/e 09/1946
BR 67395 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C12
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 250
Works Number 1159
To Service During 07/1907
Withdrawal Sat 16/03/1957
Scrapping During 03/1957
Service Life 49 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLB Hull Botanic Gardens 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 23/04/1955
31A Cambridge 5w/e 21/01/1956
   Withdrawn 16/03/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 28/01/1956
WDN   16/03/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1921 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1907 To Service To service as GNR Number 1545
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1159
   
03/1921 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
05/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 4545    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7395    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67395    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
03/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67395    

prev prev