Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1547 m/e 08/1907
LNER (1924) 4547 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 7397 m/e 11/1946
BR 67397 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C12
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 250
Works Number 1161
To Service During 08/1907
Withdrawal Sat 06/12/1958
Scrapping During 12/1958
Service Life 51 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLB Hull Botanic Gardens 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 23/04/1955
31A Cambridge 5w/e 21/01/1956
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 20/04/1957
35B Grantham 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn 06/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   06/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1921 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1907 To Service To service as GNR Number 1547
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1161
   
04/1921 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4547    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7397    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67397    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67397    

prev prev