Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 236 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 236 Week
» 17572 Month
» 295368 Year
» 1179749 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1063 m/e 06/1903
LNER (1924) 6063 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 7408 m/e 10/1946
BR 67408 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 1882
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal w/e Mon 10/05/1954
Scrapping During 05/1954
Service Life 50 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 19/01/1952
38B Annesley 4w/e 14/02/1953
38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 16/05/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 10/05/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1927 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 1063
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 1882
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6063    
12/1927 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7408    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67408    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
05/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 67408    
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Marked with an 'X' (condemned) RO 9/1954 Link

prev prev