Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2574 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15980 Week
» 68996 Month
» 188523 Year
» 3215376 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1065 |
m/e |
06/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6065 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7410 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
67410 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C13 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
1884 |
To Service |
During 06/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 23/03/1953 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1903 |
GOR |
|
Gorton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38D |
|
Staveley (G.C.) |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
23/03/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GOR |
Gorton |
9w/e |
31/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
38D |
Staveley (G.C.) |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/03/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1933 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1065 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 1884 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6065 |
|
|
03/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7410 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67410 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
23/03/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67410 |
|
|
04/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|