Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2188 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19991 Week
» 73007 Month
» 192534 Year
» 3219387 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
190 |
m/e |
08/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5190 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7416 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67416 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C13 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 08/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/12/1958 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
34E |
Neasden |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
LOAN |
14D |
Neasden |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
14D |
Neasden |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1929 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
08/1933 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/12/1958 |
Chesham Branch |
Following the withdrawal of Neasden's last GC 4-4-2T, 67416, the Chesham branch. is being worked by Ivatt 2-6-2Ts made redundant at Bedford-41270/2, 41329. 67416/8/20 had been engaged exclusively on this branch which is worked by push/pull sets. |
SLS/195902 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 190 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
02/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5190 |
|
|
04/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7416 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67416 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67416 |
|
|
02/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|