Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 917 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3056 Week
» 13226 Month
» 291022 Year
» 1175403 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 5456 y/e c. 0
GCR 456 m/e 03/1905
LNER (1946) 7433 m/e 07/1946
BR 67433 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 03/1905
Withdrawal Mon 06/01/1958
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 52 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WRX Wrexham Rhosddu 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6D Chester Northgate 2w/e 17/06/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 3w/e 12/11/1955
37A Ardsley 5w/e 17/12/1955
37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 18/02/1956
56B Ardsley 4w/e 16/03/1957
   Withdrawn 06/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1929 Superheated boiler fitted
09/1933 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 5456    
03/1905 To Service To service as GCR Number 456
Built at Gorton Works
   
07/1929 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
09/1933 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7433    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wrexham Rhosddu (WRX)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67433    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67433    

prev prev