Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3496 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16902 Week
» 69918 Month
» 189445 Year
» 3216298 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
115 |
m/e |
07/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5115 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7438 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
67438 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C13 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 13/01/1958 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39A |
Gorton |
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1930 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
07/1941 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 115 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5115 |
|
|
04/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7438 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67438 |
|
|
18/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
13/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67438 |
|
|
10/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|