Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 514 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6721 Week
» 4234 Month
» 232118 Year
» 1453683 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 453 m/e 08/1905
LNER (1924) 5453 m/e 11/1925
LNER (1946) 7439 m/e 04/1946
BR 67439 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 08/1905
Withdrawal Fri 14/11/1958
Scrapping During 12/1958
Service Life 53 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1905
GOR Gorton 01/01/1948
39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 16/05/1953
   Withdrawn 14/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NTH Northwich 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay 10/05/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 16/05/1953
WDN   14/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1935 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 General An interesting double-headed train is the 5.30 p.m. Clacton, which daily leaves with any combination of 'D.16/2,' 'D.16/3,' 'B.12/3,' and 'B.17' at the head. Spitalflelds goods has not seen very many strangers, but 3806 (6601) was a change recently. 'F.3' are still seen at Liverpool Street; locos noted being 7139 (8067), 7148 (8047), 7149 (8048), and 8081, all on the Woodford line fairly regularly between the end of June till October. This line also has had 'V.1' 7675 working along it late Sept./Oct., together with various 0-6-0Ts such as 8575, 8612, 8613, and 8633. The Ilford line usually gets the 'J.68' such as 7043 25/9 and 7048 28/8, whilst even the sparse Fenchurch Street service comes in for its share (8538 noted 30/11). The most usual 'J.15' in Liverpool Street are:-7545/6/7/60/5/6, 7641/4/6 and 5453 (7555), and they usually turn up on Brentwood or Gidea Park trains SLS/194701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1905 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 453
Built at Gorton Works
   
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5453    
04/1935 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7439    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67439    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
14/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67439    

prev