Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2209 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20012 Week
» 73028 Month
» 192555 Year
» 3219408 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
453 |
m/e |
08/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5453 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7439 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
67439 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C13 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 08/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 14/11/1958 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1905 |
GOR |
|
Gorton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
39B |
|
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/11/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NTH |
Northwich |
9w/e |
31/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/11/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1935 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 453 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5453 |
|
|
04/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7439 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67439 |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
14/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67439 |
|
|
12/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|