Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 943 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5074 Week
» 15244 Month
» 293040 Year
» 1177421 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1125 m/e 05/1907
LNER (1924) 6125 m/e 05/1925
LNER (1946) 7445 m/e 07/1946
BR 67445 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C14
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 4931
To Service During 05/1907
Withdrawal Tue 22/12/1959
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 52 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
39A Gorton 5w/e 17/01/1953
36D Barnsley 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn 22/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1935 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1907 To Service To service as GCR Number 1125
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4931
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6125    
01/1935 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7445    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67445    
17/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 67445    

prev prev