Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 291 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7751 Week
» 5264 Month
» 233148 Year
» 1454713 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1130 m/e 06/1907
LNER (1924) 6130 m/e 12/1925
LNER (1946) 7450 m/e 07/1946
BR 67450 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C14
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 4936
To Service During 06/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/01/1960
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 52 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1907
IPS Ipswich 01/01/1948
37C Bradford Hammerton Street 3w/e 31/05/1950
39A Gorton 4w/e 21/07/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 23/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street w/e 14/05/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 30/06/1951
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 23/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1931 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1130
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4936
   
12/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6130    
01/1931 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7450    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67450    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
23/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 67450    

prev prev