Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1639 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15045 Week
» 68061 Month
» 187588 Year
» 3214441 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
25 |
m/e |
03/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9025 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7467 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
67467 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
C15 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
Order Number |
E182 |
Works Number |
1081 |
To Service |
During 03/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 16/03/1955 |
Service Life |
42 yrs , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1913 |
EFD |
|
Eastfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
65E |
|
Kipps |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
65E |
|
Kipps |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/03/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65E |
Kipps |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1913 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 25 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 1081 |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9025 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7467 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67467 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
16/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67467 |
|
|