|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1913 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 16 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 1089 |
||
04/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9016 | ||
05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7475 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS) | ||
10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 67475 | ||
10/1950 | Modification | Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted | ||
25/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
22/04/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67475 |