Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1989 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20900 Week
» 85854 Month
» 288518 Year
» 3315371 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
439 |
m/e |
12/1915 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9439 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7483 |
on |
13/01/1946 |
British Railways |
67483 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1915 |
DEE |
|
Dundee Tay Bridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/04/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
on |
10/02/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/04/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1915 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 439 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21204 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9439 |
|
|
13/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7483 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67483 |
|
|
20/04/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67483 |
|
|
05/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|