Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 908 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14314 Week
» 67330 Month
» 186857 Year
» 3213710 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
443 |
m/e |
01/1916 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9443 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7487 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67487 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1916 |
PKD |
|
Parkhead |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
63C |
|
Forfar |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
65C |
|
Parkhead |
8w/e |
21/03/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/10/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
63C |
Forfar |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1952 |
Scottish Miscellany |
D33 62462 has been recently working goods traffic between Singer and Cadder Yards. On (8/9) the Eastfield Breakdown Crane was at Balloch lifting the boiler for the new Loch Lomond steamer and placing in the hull. The steamer is not yet launched. During five days 1-5 September, C16 67487 worked 7.50 a.m. Bridge-ton Cross to Helensburgh returning with 9.55 a.m. from Helensburgh. Was rather reminiscent of 1920-30 period when Class was employed on section. During visit of N.A.T.O. fleet to Clyde the ex-L.N.E. route had L.M. Class 4 2-6-0, D11 and B1 Classes on relief trains. One train, through a misprint was shown as leaving Queen Street, 4 p.m. and arriving Craigendoran 4.24 p.m., instead of 4.42 p.m. One recalls a run made about 1910 when the N.B. Ry. directors asked for a big engine to work the 4 p.m. fast boat train from Queen Street to Craigendoran. Auld Reekie, No. 872, 4-4-2, -was sent down to Bridgeton Cross. The train did the run in 32 minutes, but the engine came back light and no Atlantic Class engine went back to Helensburgh traffic trains. The Civil Engineer vetoed their use, and replaced many chairs after the record run. The desired publicity was squashed. |
SLS/195212 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1916 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 443 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21208 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9443 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7487 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67487 |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Forfar (63C) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
22/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67487 |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|