|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1951 | \"K2\" runs hot | 'K2' No. 61722 recently ran hot near Milngavie Junction, and was immediately removed from its train and placed in a siding. 'C16' (6)7488 happened to be coming light from Milngavie at the time and was put on to the 'West Highland' to Queen St. The train was delayed only nine minutes, through quick action on the part of all concerned. The brasses of 61722 had almost ceased to exist when she was finally got into the siding. | SLS/195111 |
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1916 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 444 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21209 |
||
01/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9444 | ||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7488 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) | ||
26/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
06/1952 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 67488 | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
29/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmont (64E) | ||
09/10/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67488 | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |