Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1626 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15032 Week
» 68048 Month
» 187575 Year
» 3214428 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
445 |
m/e |
02/1916 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9445 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7489 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
67489 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
03/09/1955 |
LOAN |
64C |
Dalry Road |
4w/e |
01/10/1955 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/02/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/10/1956 |
Farewell North Tyne Branch (Hawick shed) |
The last passenger trains between Newcastle and stations on the North Tyne Branch to Riccarton Junction and the last through train from Newcastle to Hawick and back, ran on Saturday, 13th October. The 11.10 a.m. train to Hawick was advertised as a public excursion and was well patronised. The train comprised six coaches of modern stock hauled by K1 2-6-0 62022, the smokebox of which was adorned with a wreath of flowers and heather surrounding a card with the letter-ing R.I.P. At Hexham, two additional coaches had to be added to accommodate passengers joining the train there and further up the branch line. Due to the length of the train, it was necessary to draw up at most of the branch line stations and on some of the grades, the K1 2-6-0 found the going heavy. At Riccarton Junction, J37 0-6-0 64539 gave banking assistance to Whitrope summit and the train arrived at Hawick nearly half an hour late. For the return journey commenced at 4.32 p.m., banking assistance was given from Hawick by D30 4-4-0 62440 ' Wandering Willie '. Many local people turned out at stations down the line to bid farewell, the largest gathering being at Bellingham where a crowd of school children cheered the train on its way. Several S.L.S. members travelled on the train and others were seen by the lineside en route taking photographs. Locomotives observed at Hawick shed included the following: 61398, 61851, 61855, 62423, 62428, 62432, 62440, 64463, 65232, 65317, 67489, 78047. |
SLS/195701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1916 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 445 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21210 |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9445 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7489 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67489 |
|
|
02/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
01/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hawick (64G) |
|
|
15/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67489 |
|
|
03/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|