|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. | SLS/194912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1916 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 451 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21216 |
||
03/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9451 | ||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7495 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) | ||
11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 67495 | ||
22/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmont (64E) | ||
16/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
09/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hawick (64G) | ||
05/1956 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
08/05/1956 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67495 |