Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 126 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4638 Week
» 27144 Month
» 330334 Year
» 1551899 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North British Railway 515 m/e 03/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 9515 m/e 09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7501 on 17/03/1946
British Railways 67501 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class C16
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L740
Works Number 22687
To Service During 03/1921
Withdrawal Fri 22/04/1960
Scrapping During 06/1960
Service Life 39 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1921
EFD Eastfield on 01/01/1948
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 06/10/1951
61C Keith 4w/e 13/04/1957
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 21/12/1957
   Withdrawn on 22/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 28/12/1957
WDN   on 22/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1921 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 515
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22687
   
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9515    
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7501    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67501    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
13/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
21/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
22/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 67501    

prev prev