Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 538 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18341 Week
» 71357 Month
» 190884 Year
» 3217737 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
516 |
m/e |
03/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9516 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7502 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
67502 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1921 |
EFD |
|
Eastfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
DEE |
|
Dundee Tay Bridge |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/04/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/04/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1921 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 516 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22688 |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9516 |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7502 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67502 |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) |
|
|
22/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67502 |
|
|
06/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|