Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 129 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4641 Week
» 27147 Month
» 330337 Year
» 1551902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1337 m/e 10/1899
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4337 m/e 01/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2163 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 62163 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class D2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D210/1899
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 216
Works Number 853
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service During 10/1899
Withdrawal Sat 16/10/1948
Service Life 49 yrs , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1899
HIT Hitchin (GNR) on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 16/10/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HITL Hitchin (GNR) w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC TUX Tuxford w/e 17/01/1948
WDN HITL Hitchin (GNR) on 16/10/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1935 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1899 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1337
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 853
   
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4337    
03/1935 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2163    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hitchin (GNR) (HIT )    
16/10/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 2163    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62163 but not taken up    

prev prev