Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1076 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6674 Week
» 29180 Month
» 332370 Year
» 1553935 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1361 m/e 11/1899
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4361 m/e 09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2167 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 62167 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class D2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D211/1899
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 216
Works Number 857
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service During 11/1899
Withdrawal During 02/1949
Service Life 49 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1899
GRA Grantham on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YK York (North) m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC YK York (North) m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC LEI Leicester (G.C.) w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 19/06/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1929 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1899 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1361
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 857
   
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4361    
11/1929 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2167    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Grantham (GRA)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62167 but not taken up    
02/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 2167    

prev prev