Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 2426 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15832 Week
» 68848 Month
» 188375 Year
» 3215228 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1369 |
m/e |
10/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4369 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2172 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
62172 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
D2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
221 |
Works Number |
906 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 19/06/1951 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1900 |
GRA |
|
Grantham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/06/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GRA |
Grantham |
w/e |
01/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/06/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/07/1949 |
Derby Friargate MPD |
On 17/7 the following were noted at the ex G.N.R*. shed here, during the evening:-'D.2' Nos. 62172, 2173/77; 'D.3' No. 2123; 'J.5' Nos. 65484/85, 5497; 'J.6' No.4215; 'J.69' No. 8527. On this date, owing to extensive P.W. repairs on the ex L.M.S. line between Repton and Pear Tree Junction, involving a long section of single line working, certain ex L.M.S. trains from Burton to Derby were diverted via Dove Junction and Egginton over the ex G.N. line to Derby (with ex L.N.E.R. pilotmen from Egginton), passengers being conveyed from Derby (Friargate) to the ex L.M.S. station by omnibus. *The ex G.N. shed at Derby, the entrance to which is in Slack Lane (off Uttoxeter Old Road), is well worth a visit by members visiting the ex L.M.S. Works and Shed at Derby. |
SLS/194909 |
31/12/1950 |
Withdrawals |
Among the withdrawals will be noticed 43319 (Johnson goods, built in 1892 as M.R. 2042, class 2F, reboilered as 3F in 1905); 4162 (built in 1900 as M. & G.N. 87) one of the few small-boilered Ivatt goods and 7111 (built in 1896 as M.S. & L. 783), the last of its class to remain in service, recently on the push-pull service between Finsbury Park and Alexandra Palace. Also, the withdrawal of 2132, leaves only one Ivatt 4-4-0 class D.3 in stock (No. 62000, at Grantham) with side-window cab, used for working the official saloon. There is also one surviving D.2 (No. 62172 at Colwick). |
SLS/195102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1369 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 906 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4369 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2172 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62172 |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
19/06/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62172 |
|
|