Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 143 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1177 Week
» 23683 Month
» 326873 Year
» 1548438 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1383 m/e 12/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4383 m/e 11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2181 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 62181 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class D2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D212/1900
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 221
Works Number 914
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal Sat 25/11/1950
Service Life 49 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1900
BOS Boston on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 25/11/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 20/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/08/1947 Doncaster Works On 17/8 the following withdrawn locos. (still complete) were in the Works yard: 'D3' 2127/42/47; 'D2' 2171/86/91/96; 'Cl' 2800/12; '03' 3490/92; 'J3' 4155; 'C12' 7396 and Railcars R51909/13; whilst the following: 'D3' 2123, 'D2' 2181 and 'Dl' 2203 were observed stripped. Locos. awaiting Works or scrapping were: 'Bl' 1091, 'D3' 2139, 'D2' 2170/73, 'J3' 4121 and 'J55' 8319. W.D. No. 77003 was noted in the Erecting Shop. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1383
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 914
   
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4383    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2181    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62181 but not taken up    
25/11/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 2181    

prev prev