Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 785 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14191 Week
» 67207 Month
» 186734 Year
» 3213587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1395 |
m/e |
03/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4395 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2190 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
62190 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
D2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
993 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1903 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1949 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1903 |
NWE |
|
New England |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
09/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NWE |
New England |
w/e |
01/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
WDN |
CLK |
Colwick |
on |
05/09/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1395 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 993 |
|
|
09/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4395 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2190 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62190 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2190 |
|
|