Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 45 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1970 Week
» 19306 Month
» 297102 Year
» 1181483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1040 m/e 03/1903
LNER (1924) 6040 m/e 01/1925
LNER (1946) 2324 m/e 07/1946
BR 62324 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class D9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D903/1903
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number E1198
Works Number 4966
To Service During 03/1903
Withdrawal Mon 07/11/1949 off Brunswick (LIV)
Scrapping During 11/1949
Service Life 46 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIV Brunswick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 07/11/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC SL South Lynn m/e 28/02/1946
WDN LIV Brunswick 07/11/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1919 Rebuilt with Piston Valves
03/1919 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 1040
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4966
   
03/1919 Modification Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves    
03/1919 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6040    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2324    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Brunswick (LIV)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62324    
11/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 62324 from Brunswick (LIV)    

prev prev