Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1788 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19591 Week
» 72607 Month
» 192134 Year
» 3218987 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1040 |
m/e |
03/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6040 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2324 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
62324 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
D9 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
E1198 |
Works Number |
4966 |
To Service |
During 03/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/11/1949 off Brunswick (LIV) |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
ALLOC |
SL |
South Lynn |
m/e |
28/02/1946 |
WDN |
LIV |
Brunswick |
on |
07/11/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1919 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
03/1919 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1040 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4966 |
|
|
03/1919 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
03/1919 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6040 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Peterborough East (PBE) |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2324 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brunswick (LIV) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62324 |
|
|
11/1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/11/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62324 from Brunswick (LIV) |
|
|