Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 447 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4046 Week
» 10180 Month
» 238064 Year
» 1459629 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 108 m/e 04/1904
LNER (1924) 5108 m/e 04/1926
LNER (1946) 2330 m/e 08/1946
BR 62330 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class D9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D904/1904
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 1921
To Service During 04/1904
Withdrawal Mon 15/08/1949
Scrapping During 08/1949
Service Life 45 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1904
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 15/08/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 16/07/1949
WDN TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 15/08/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1913 Superheated boiler fitted
10/1913 Rebuilt with Piston Valves


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/08/1947 Darlington Works The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 108
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 1921
   
10/1913 Modification Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves    
10/1913 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
04/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 5108    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2330    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62330    
15/08/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 62330    

prev prev