Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1683 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15089 Week
» 68105 Month
» 187632 Year
» 3214485 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway |
2651 |
y/e |
c. 0 |
British Railways |
62651 |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
D10 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/03/1953 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/03/1953 |
First withdrawals |
Among the engines withdrawn on 9th March were two representatives of Classes hitherto intact. No. 62651, one of the original G.C. 'Directors' of Class '11E' (L.N.E. Class 'D10') was built at Gorton in October, 1913, as No. 430 Purdon Viccars and was a regular visitor to Neasden. It was renumbered 2651 in October, 1946, and 62651 in August, 1948. It was withdrawn from Northwich L.M.R. (9G). There were only ten engines in this Class. No. 65484 was built at Doncaster in 1910 (works No. 1270) as G.N.R. No. 25 Class 'J22' (L.N.E. Class 'J5') and when new went to New England, painted in the standard lined green of that period. It was renumbered from 3025 to 5484 in November, 1946, and 65484 in April, 1949. It was withdrawn from Colwick (38A) where all the Class is stationed, though one is usually subshedded at Leicester (38C). |
SLS/195306 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2651 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62651 |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
03/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/03/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62651 |
|
|