Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4258 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17664 Week
» 70680 Month
» 190207 Year
» 3217060 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway |
2652 |
y/e |
c. 0 |
British Railways |
62652 |
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
D10 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1913 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/05/1954 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1954 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1913 |
NTH |
|
Northwich |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
08/05/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NTH |
Northwich |
on |
08/09/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/05/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2652 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northwich (NTH) |
|
|
05/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62652 |
|
|
05/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/05/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62652 |
|
|