|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/08/1957 | Darnall MPD | The electric shed was closed as from 17th August and is to be converted to a diesel depot. Dll's in store at present are 62660/3/6/7/70. | SLS/195711 |
09/08/1958 | DarnallMPD | Dll 62662 Prince of Wales is ex-works fully lined out and kept smart in contrast to the other D1 ls (62660/1/4-70) at this shed. All the D11s in the south are now on the GC section; in addition to Sheffield -Nottingham locals (a Staveley one even works to Leicester) they also work locals to Lincoln. | SLS/195809 |
02/05/1959 | Staveley MPD (41H) ex GCR | 62665 has gone from store to Gorton Works for overhaul; 62663 is back at work on the GC line (Sheffield-Nottingham-Leicester). D11s still stored on 2nd May are 62660/1/6/9. Three diesel shunters from 41A shunt in the yards here. | SLS/195907 |
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Old Iron Foundry) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1919 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 506, name: BUTLER-HENDERSON Built at Gorton Works |
||
06/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5506 | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2660 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) | ||
10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62660 | ||
24/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
21/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
20/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62660 |