Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 4383 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19995 Week
» 118640 Month
» 321304 Year
» 3348157 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
509 |
m/e |
03/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5509 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2663 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62663 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
Large/Scottish Director |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 03/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/05/1960 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1945 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/08/1957 |
Darnall MPD |
The electric shed was closed as from 17th August and is to be converted to a diesel depot. Dll's in store at present are 62660/3/6/7/70. |
SLS/195711 |
02/05/1959 |
Staveley MPD (41H) ex GCR |
62665 has gone from store to Gorton Works for overhaul; 62663 is back at work on the GC line (Sheffield-Nottingham-Leicester). D11s still stored on 2nd May are 62660/1/6/9. Three diesel shunters from 41A shunt in the yards here. |
SLS/195907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 509, name: PRINCE ALBERT Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5509 |
|
|
12/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2663 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62663 |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
23/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62663 |
|
|
06/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|