Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 350 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 350 Week
» 17686 Month
» 295482 Year
» 1179863 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 509 m/e 03/1920
LNER (1924) 5509 m/e 08/1924
LNER (1946) 2663 m/e 10/1946
BR 62663 m/e 08/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/1920 PRINCE ALBERT

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 03/1920
Withdrawal Mon 23/05/1960
Scrapping During 06/1960
Service Life 40 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40A Lincoln 5w/e 24/07/1954
41A Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 20/04/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 10/05/1958
   Withdrawn 23/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1945 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1920 To Service To service as GCR Number 509, name: PRINCE ALBERT
Built at Gorton Works
   
08/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5509    
12/1945 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2663    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62663    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 62663    

prev prev