Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
510 |
m/e |
05/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5510 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2664 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62664 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
Large/Scottish Director |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/08/1960 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1945 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/03/1948 |
Gorton Works |
On 22/3 the following locomotives were observed renumbered: in the Erecting Shop Nos. 63765, 64302, 65197 an 69326, while outside the Erecting Shop were Nos. 62664 an 64407. Also recently ex works were Nos. E3243 and E9288, which apparently are the last locomotives to leave Gorton Works, bearing the short-lived prefix E. |
SLS/194805 |
09/08/1958 |
DarnallMPD |
Dll 62662 Prince of Wales is ex-works fully lined out and kept smart in contrast to the other D1 ls (62660/1/4-70) at this shed. All the D11s in the south are now on the GC section; in addition to Sheffield -Nottingham locals (a Staveley one even works to Leicester) they also work locals to Lincoln. |
SLS/195809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 510, name: PRINCESS MARY Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5510 |
|
|
09/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2664 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62664 |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62664 |
|
|