Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 510 m/e 05/1920
LNER (1924) 5510 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 2664 m/e 09/1946
BR 62664 m/e 04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1920 PRINCESS MARY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 05/1920
Withdrawal Mon 08/08/1960
Scrapping During 08/1960
Service Life 40 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 27/01/1951
9G Northwich 4w/e 26/03/1955
41A Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 08/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1945 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1920 To Service To service as GCR Number 510, name: PRINCESS MARY
Built at Gorton Works
   
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5510    
09/1945 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2664    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62664    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 62664    

prev prev