|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/08/1957 | Darnall MPD | The electric shed was closed as from 17th August and is to be converted to a diesel depot. Dll's in store at present are 62660/3/6/7/70. | SLS/195711 |
09/08/1958 | DarnallMPD | Dll 62662 Prince of Wales is ex-works fully lined out and kept smart in contrast to the other D1 ls (62660/1/4-70) at this shed. All the D11s in the south are now on the GC section; in addition to Sheffield -Nottingham locals (a Staveley one even works to Leicester) they also work locals to Lincoln. | SLS/195809 |
02/05/1959 | Staveley MPD (41H) ex GCR | 62665 has gone from store to Gorton Works for overhaul; 62663 is back at work on the GC line (Sheffield-Nottingham-Leicester). D11s still stored on 2nd May are 62660/1/6/9. Three diesel shunters from 41A shunt in the yards here. | SLS/195907 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1922 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 502, name: ZEEBRUGGE Built at Gorton Works |
||
11/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5502 | ||
07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2666 | ||
08/1947 | Modification | Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) | ||
09/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62666 | ||
22/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
04/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
14/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
25/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
24/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
20/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
08/06/1957 | Report | Report: Two "Jubilees," Nos. 45621 (67A) and 45654 (19B), were also recorded (on Bridlington’s Whitsun traffic) during the weekend, and our correspondent also heard but could not confirm that Darnall "D11" 4-4-0 No. 62666 appeared on an excursion from Sheffield. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
25/06/1957 | Report | Report: We noted the “D11" (62666) at York again on June 25. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
12/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
05/12/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62666 |