Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 6384 m/e 09/1924
LNER (1946) 2677 m/e 08/1946
BR 62677 m/e 04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1924 EDIE OCHILTREE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 5385
To Service During 09/1924
Withdrawal Wed 26/08/1959
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 34 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAY Haymarket 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 11/05/1957
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 04/07/1959
   Withdrawn 26/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1948 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 6384, name: EDIE OCHILTREE
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5385
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2677    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY)    
04/1948 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62677    
11/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
04/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 62677    

prev prev