Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 6386 m/e 10/1924
LNER (1946) 2679 m/e 08/1946
BR 62679 w/e 18/11/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1924 LORD GLENALLAN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 5387
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Wed 10/09/1958
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 33 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAY Haymarket 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 11/05/1957
   Withdrawn 10/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1956 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 6386, name: LORD GLENALLAN
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5387
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2679    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 62679    
06/1956 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
11/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62679    

prev prev