Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 475 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14518 Week
» 79472 Month
» 282136 Year
» 3308989 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1886 |
m/e |
06/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8886 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7756 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2517 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
62517 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D14 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
M51 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/09/1959 off March (31B) |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1925 |
Saturated Diagram 27 Boiler Fitted |
10/1925 |
Diagram 27Sat boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
07/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1929 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
03/1929 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
05/1936 |
GNR style Chimney fitted |
04/1940 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1940 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1886 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8886 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sat boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated Diagram 27 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
07/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1929 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
05/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted |
|
|
04/1940 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7756 but not taken up |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2517 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62517 |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
28/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62517 from March (31B) |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|