Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 187 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 187 Week
» 18969 Month
» 267262 Year
» 1151643 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1870 m/e 03/1902
LNER (1924) 8870 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7740 m/e 12/1942
LNER (1946) 2521 m/e 17/03/1946
BR 62521 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D14
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D1403/1902
Claud Hamilton04/1924
D16/305/1935
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number F53
To Service During 03/1902
Withdrawal Mon 10/02/1958 off Kings Lynn (31C)
Scrapping During 04/1958
Service Life 55 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YAR Yarmouth South Town 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 18/04/1953
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 19/01/1957
31A Cambridge 5w/e 20/04/1957
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn 10/02/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1924 Vacuum Ejector fitted
04/1924 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
04/1924 Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted
06/1928 Extended Smokebox fitted
05/1935 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted
05/1935 Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1902 To Service To service as GER Number 1870
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8870    
04/1924 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
04/1924 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted    
04/1924 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1928 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
05/1935 Modification Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
05/1935 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
12/1942 Renumbered Renumbered to 7740    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2521    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth South Town (YAR)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62521    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
02/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62521 from Kings Lynn (31C)    

prev prev