Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 80 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 5227 Week
» 15397 Month
» 293193 Year
» 1177574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1871 m/e 03/1902
LNER (1924) 8871 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7741 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2522 m/e 06/1946
BR 62522 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D14
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D1403/1902
Claud Hamilton04/1924
D16/305/1938
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number F53
To Service During 03/1902
Withdrawal Mon 04/08/1958 off Cambridge (31A)
Scrapping During 10/1958
Service Life 56 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 21/01/1956
31A Cambridge 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 04/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1924 Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted
04/1924 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
04/1924 Vacuum Ejector fitted
07/1929 Extended Smokebox fitted
06/1936 GNR style Chimney fitted
05/1938 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
05/1938 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1902 To Service To service as GER Number 1871
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8871    
04/1924 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
04/1924 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted    
04/1924 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1929 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
06/1936 Modification Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted    
05/1938 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
05/1938 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7741 but not taken up    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2522    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62522    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62522 from Cambridge (31A)    

prev prev