Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1874 m/e 03/1902
LNER (1924) 8874 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7744 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2525 y/e 16/03/1946
BR 62525 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D14
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D1403/1902
Claud Hamilton05/1919
D16/306/1938
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number F53
To Service During 03/1902
Withdrawal Mon 19/09/1955 off Cambridge (31A)
Service Life 53 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 19/04/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 15/11/1952
   Withdrawn 19/09/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
05/1919 Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted
07/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted
12/1932 Extended Smokebox fitted
05/1936 GNR style Chimney fitted
06/1938 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
06/1938 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1902 To Service To service as GER Number 1874
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
05/1919 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
05/1919 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8874    
07/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/1932 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
05/1936 Modification Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted    
06/1938 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
06/1938 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7744 but not taken up    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2525    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62525    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/09/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62525 from Cambridge (31A)    

prev prev