Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 619 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6826 Week
» 4339 Month
» 232223 Year
» 1453788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1879 m/e 05/1902
LNER (1924) 8879 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7749 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2530 m/e 06/1946
BR 62530 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D14
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D1405/1902
Claud Hamilton12/1927
D16/304/1938
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number F53
To Service During 05/1902
Withdrawal Mon 22/09/1958 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 11/1958
Service Life 56 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1902
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
31B March 4w/e 14/12/1957
   Withdrawn 22/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 12/10/1946
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC KL Kings Lynn w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 30/11/1957
WDN   22/09/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
by 1924 Vacuum Ejector fitted
12/1927 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox)
12/1927 Extended Smokebox fitted
06/1936 GNR style Chimney fitted
04/1938 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
04/1938 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1902 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1879
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
1924 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8879    
12/1927 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
12/1927 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
06/1936 Modification Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted    
04/1938 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
04/1938 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7749 but not taken up    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2530    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62530    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62530 from March (31B)    

prev prev