Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1764 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19567 Week
» 72583 Month
» 192110 Year
» 3218963 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1879 |
m/e |
05/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8879 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7749 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2530 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62530 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D14 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F53 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/09/1958 off March (31B) |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
12/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
15/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
KL |
Kings Lynn |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/09/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1927 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
12/1927 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
06/1936 |
GNR style Chimney fitted |
04/1938 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1938 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1879 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8879 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
06/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted |
|
|
04/1938 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1938 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7749 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2530 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62530 |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
22/09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62530 from March (31B) |
|
|
11/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|